Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0899827

EP0899827 - Low crosstalk assembly structure for use in a communication plug [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.07.2010
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.08.2010  [2010/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Larsen, Wayne David
7630 Cape Cod Circle
Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US
02 / Pharney, Julian Robert
8386 Eastbay Dr.
Indianapolis, IN 46326 / US
03 / Lin, Chen-Chieh
1908 Fairhaven Dr.
Indianapolis, IN 46229 / US
04 / Reichard Jr., George Willis
1206 Hillcrest Dr.
Carmel, IN 46033 / US
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London
WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [1999/09]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date98306769.525.08.1998
[1999/09]
Priority number, dateUS1997092258003.09.1997         Original published format: US 922580
[1999/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0899827
Date:03.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0899827
Date:04.10.2000
[2000/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R23/02, H01R23/00
[1999/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/25]
Former [1999/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zusammenbaustruktur mit niedrigem Übersprechungsrausch für Nachrichtenstecker[1999/09]
English:Low crosstalk assembly structure for use in a communication plug[1999/09]
French:Structure d'assemblage avec faible bruit diaphonique pour connecteur de communication[1999/09]
Examination procedure30.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
22.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/34]
08.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200912   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5226835  (BAKER III FRANK P [US], et al) [X] 8-11 * column 3, line 30 - column 5; figures 1-7 * [Y] 1-7;
 [Y]EP0434256  (AMP INC [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 9, line 22 - column 10, line 45; figures 1-28 *;
 [A]WO9637015  (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *