blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0902345

EP0902345 - Probe coordinate system driving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.09.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 213-0012 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kimura, Tetsuo
c/o Mitutoyo Corporation, 2200 Shimoguri-cho
Tsukuba-shi, Tochihi-ken 321-0723 / JP
02 / Noda, Takashi
c/o Mitutoyo Corporation, 2200 Shimoguri-cho
Tsukuba-shi, Tochihi-ken 321-0723 / JP
[1999/11]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]Skone James, Robert Edmund
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98307010.301.09.1998
[1999/11]
Priority number, dateJP1997026778512.09.1997         Original published format: JP 26778597
[1999/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0902345
Date:17.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0902345
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:G05B19/41
[1999/11]
CPC:
G05B19/41 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [1999/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät zum Antrieb einers Probekoordinatensystems[1999/11]
English:Probe coordinate system driving apparatus[1999/11]
French:Appareil d'entrainement du système de coordonnées d'un capteur[1999/11]
Examination procedure10.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
09.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/44]
02.06.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0762247  (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figure 1A *;
 [A]EP0398704  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 59 * * figures 1,2,6 *;
 [A]EP0560196  (MAUSER WERKE OBERNDORF [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - line 51 *;
 [A]DE1552554  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 3 * * figures 2,4 *
 [A]  - KATEBI M R ET AL, "TOTAL CONTROL OF FAST COORDINATE MEASURING MACHINES", IEE PROCEEDINGS D. CONTROL THEORY & APPLICATIONS,GB,INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, vol. 141, no. 6, ISSN 1350-2379, page 373-384, XP000491283 [A] 1,3 * abstract * * figures 1A,1B *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-cta:19941499
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.