Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0901128

EP0901128 - Method and apparatus for adjustment and control of an interactive method of recording analog signals with on chip selection of a voltage ramp amplitude [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.10.2003  [2003/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INFORMATION STORAGE DEVICES, INC.
2045 Hamilton Avenue
San Jose, CA 95125 / US
[1999/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Engh, Lawrence D.
105 Hyde Street
Redwood City, California 94062 / US
[1999/10]
Representative(s)Wombwell, Francis , et al
Forresters
15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/10]Wombwell, Francis , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date98307093.903.09.1998
[1999/10]
Priority number, dateUS1997092439705.09.1997         Original published format: US 924397
[1999/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0901128
Date:10.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0901128
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11C11/56, G11C27/00, G11C16/06
[1999/33]
Former International [1999/10]G11C11/56, G11C27/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/01]
Former [1999/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung zur Justierung und Steuerung eines interaktiven Verfahrens zur Aufnahme von analogen Signalen durch On-Chip-Auswahl einer Spannungsrampenamplitude[1999/10]
English:Method and apparatus for adjustment and control of an interactive method of recording analog signals with on chip selection of a voltage ramp amplitude[1999/10]
French:Méthode et appareil d'ajustement et de commande d'une méthode interactive pour enregistrer des signaux analogiques par sélection sur la puce d'une rampe de tension[1999/10]
Examination procedure13.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
01.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/41]
07.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5623436  (SOWARDS DAVID [US], et al) [X] 16 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 9 * [A] 8,15;
 [YA]US5289401  (SHIMA TAKESHI [JP]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 14 - column 9, line 32 * * figures 1,5,7 * [A] 8,15;
 [PY]US5761118  (CHAI YONG-YOONG [KR]) [PY] 1 * the whole document *;
 JPH09180490  [ ] (SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC);
 [A]US4628487  (SMAYLING MICHAEL C [US]) [A] 1,8,15 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 58 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US5566111  (CHOI WOONG-LIM [KR]) [A] 8,15 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 7 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]EP0782149  (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 1,6,9 * page 3, line 45 - line 55 * * figures 6,7 *;
 [A]US5363055  (RIBNER DAVID B [US]) [A] 2,10 * column 1, line 1 - line 68 *;
 [A]US5627784  (ROOHPARVAR FRANKIE F [US]) [A] 16 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 55 *