Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0902058

EP0902058 - Curable organosiloxane compositions and sealants or elastomers therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.04.2002  [2002/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
P.O. Box 994
Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
DOW CORNING CORPORATION
P.O. Box 994
Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Alvarez, Khristopher Edward
4503 Ottawa Street
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
02 / Norris, Ann Walstrom
5102 Foster Road
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
03 / Watson, Michael John
1912 Norwood Drive
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
[1999/11]
Representative(s)Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date98307156.404.09.1998
[1999/11]
Priority number, dateUS1997092610709.09.1997         Original published format: US 926107
[1999/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0902058
Date:17.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0902058
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08L83/04
[1999/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [1999/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Härtbare Organosiloxanzusammensetzungen und daraus erhältliche Dichtungen oder Elastomere[1999/11]
English:Curable organosiloxane compositions and sealants or elastomers therefrom[1999/11]
French:Compositions d'organosiloxane durcissables et joints ou élastomères à partir de celles-ci[1999/11]
Examination procedure23.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
08.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/17]
22.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5629399  (JUEN DONNIE R [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 5, line 42 - line 43 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [DY]US2684349  (WHELTON JOHN J) [DY] 1-8 * example 1 * * column 6, line 9 - line 12 *;
 [Y]EP0507481  (DOW CORNING SA [BE]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *