Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0903875

EP0903875 - Optical transmission line automatic power shut-down system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.09.2001
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]For all designated states
Lucent Technologies Inc.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
Lucent Technologies Inc.
500 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Goel, Vibha Prakash
4271 Norwalk Dr.X110
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
02 / McKay, Bradley A.
6 Lewis Lane
Fair Haven, New Jersey 07704 / US
[1999/18]
Former [1999/12]01 / Goel, Vibha Prakash
52 Charles Drive
Tinton Falls, New Jersey 07753 / US
02 / McKay, Bradley A.
6 Lewis Lane
Fair Haven, New Jersey 07704 / US
Representative(s)Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue
Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/12]Johnston, Kenneth Graham , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date98307220.808.09.1998
[1999/12]
Priority number, dateUS1997093267918.09.1997         Original published format: US 932679
[1999/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0903875
Date:24.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0903875
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/152, H04B10/08
[2001/02]
Former International [1999/12]H04B10/152
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/39]
Former [1999/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatisches Leistungsabschaltungssystem einer optischen Übertragungsstrecke[1999/12]
English:Optical transmission line automatic power shut-down system[1999/12]
French:Système d'arrêt automatique de puissance d'une ligne de transmission optique[1999/12]
Examination procedure28.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
31.08.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0382243  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 19 * * column 7, line 21 - line 47 * * column 12, line 24 - line 41 * * figures 4A,4B * [A] 7,8 [Y] 3-6,12;
 [YA]EP0437162  (IBM [US]) [Y] 3-6,9-12 * column 4, line 20 - line 41 * * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 20 * * figure 1 * [A] 7,8;
 [YA]WO9724823  (MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [Y] 9-11 * page 8, line 17 - line 31 * * page 10, line 18 - line 24 * * page 11, line 1 - line 7 * * page 15, line 18 - page 16, line 2 * * page 16, line 19 - line 21 * * figures 3C,6A,6B * [A] 7,8