Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0905194

EP0905194 - Alkoxy-functional RTV compositions of increased green strength and storage stability [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.06.2001 [2001/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
DOW CORNING CORPORATION
3901 S. Saginaw Road
Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US
Inventor(s)01 / De Buyl, François
Rue de l'Equateur 8
1180 Brussels / BE
02 / Krahnke, Robert Harold
2905 St. Mary's Drive
Midland, Michigan 48640 / US
03 / Lueder, Timothy Brian
6545 W. Remus Road
Mt. Pleasant, Michigan 48858 / US
04 / Palmer, Richard Alan
2406 Plymouth Street
Midland, Michigan 48642 / US
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Hall, Marina
Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]Hall, Marina
Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date98307307.309.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateUS1997093752525.09.1997         Original published format: US 937525
[1999/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0905194
Date:31.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0905194
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08L83/04, C08L83/14, C08K5/057, C08G65/32, C08L71/02
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/41]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Alkoxy-funktionelle RTV-Zusammensetzungen mit verbesserter Anfangsfestigkeit und Lagerfähigkeit[1999/13]
English:Alkoxy-functional RTV compositions of increased green strength and storage stability[1999/13]
French:Compositions RTV à fonctions alkoxy avec résistance initiale et stabilité au stockage améliorée[1999/13]
Examination procedure15.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
16.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/25]
16.01.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0853101  (DOW CORNING [US]) [PX] 1-10 * page 3, line 47 - page 10, line 10; claims 1-9 *;
 [XY]EP0747443  (DOW CORNING SA [BE]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 56; examples 1-4; claims 1-15; tables 1-5 * [Y] 1-10;
 [Y]US5246980  (PALMER RICHARD A [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 5, line 31 - line 38 *;
 [Y]EP0735101  (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 40 - line 50 *;
 [Y]US5266631  (ARAI MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, line 30 - line 62 *