Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0903903

EP0903903 - Public communications services distribution method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2005Refusal of applicationpublished on 10.08.2005  [2005/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/41]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Former [1999/28]For all designated states
NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION
World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Former [1999/12]For all designated states
NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th Floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / McDonald, John Maurice
41 Colony Trail Blvd
Holland Landing, Ontario L9N 1C7 / CA
02 / Hillson, Andrew Raines
200 Douglas Shore Close SE
Calgary, Alberta T2Z 2K7 / CA
03 / Fielding, Bruce Allen
PO Box 448
Bragg Creek, Alberta T0L 0K0 / CA
04 / Judd, James Marshall
1057 South Sherman Street
Richardson, TX 75081 / US
05 / Isgro, Nick
25 Purley Crescent
Scarborough, Ontario M1M 1E7 / CA
06 / Jansen, Bernard Gerald
64 Horned Owl Drive
Brampton, Ontario L6R 1C5 / CA
[1999/12]
Representative(s)Loven, Keith James
Loven
Patents & Trademarks
West Central
Runcorn Road
Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/29]Loven, Keith James
Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street
Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB
Former [1999/12]Ryan, John Peter William
Nortel Patents, London Road
Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB
Application number, filing date98307360.211.09.1998
[1999/12]
Priority number, dateUS1997092851712.09.1997         Original published format: US 928517
[1999/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0903903
Date:24.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0903903
Date:12.09.2001
[2001/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, G06F17/30, G07F7/10
[1999/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/23]
Former [1999/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verteilungs-Verfahren und -Vorrichtung für öffentliche Kommunikationsdienste[1999/12]
English:Public communications services distribution method and apparatus[1999/12]
French:Méthode et équipement de distribution de services de communication publics[1999/12]
Examination procedure15.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/17]
22.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2005Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/32]
03.03.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.03.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0720412  (AT & T CORP) [X] 1-7,14-19,24-34 * abstract * * column 2, line 7 - line 18 * * column 2, line 57 - column 6, line 11 * [Y] 8,20-22;
 [X]WO9714118  (SUNTEK SOFTWARE CORP) [X] 1-3,14-21,24,29 * abstract * * page 5, line 10 - page 13, line 24 *;
 [A]US5602905  (METTKE RICHARD P) [A] 1-34 * column 2, line 3 - line 13 *;
 [E]WO9849634  (SABRE GROUP INC) [E] 1-34 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9840826  (IBM UK ;IBM (US)) [E] 1-34 * the whole document *;
 [PX]DE19628168  (IBM) [PX] 1-34 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "CHANGEABLE ADVERTISING DISPLAY", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19970201), vol. 40, no. 2, ISSN 0018-8689, page 11, XP000692153 [Y] 8 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "INTERNET KIOSK TOUCH PANEL SHELL", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19960801), vol. 39, no. 8, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 85 - 87, XP000638146 [Y] 20-22 * the whole document *