EP0917300 - A branching unit for an underwater communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicol, George Wright 1B Dacre Gardens Brandram Road, London SE13 OAG / GB | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Harrison, David Christopher MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1999/20] | Finnie, Peter John Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307383.4 | 11.09.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | GB19970022560 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9722560 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0917300 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0917300 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/44 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
H04B3/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/38] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verzweigungseinheit für ein Unterwassernachrichtenübertragungssystem | [1999/20] | English: | A branching unit for an underwater communications system | [1999/20] | French: | Unité de bifurcation d'un système de communication sous-marin | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/17] | 12.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.08.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5491368 (YAMAMOTO HIROSHI) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 26 - line 55 * * column 6, line 28 - line 35 * * column 7, line 55 - line 65 * [Y] 6-9; | [Y]GB2287625 (STC SUBMARINE SYSTEMS LTD) [Y] 6-9 * page 3, line 16 - line 26 * * page 4, line 17 - line 31; figures 1,2 * * page 5, line 4 - line 16 * |