Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0904745

EP0904745 - Endolumenal prosthesis and method of use in bifurcation regions of body lumens [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic AVE, Inc.
3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa
California 95403 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
Medtronic Ave, Inc.
3576 Unocal Place
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
Arterial Vascular Engineering, Inc.
3576 Unocal Place
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Colombo, Antonio
Via Buonarroti 48
20145 Milan / IT
02 / Lashinski, Robert D.
9519 Mill Station Road
Sebastopol, California 95472 / US
03 / Birdsall, Matthew J.
2561 Barona Place, Santa Rosa
California 95405 / US
04 / Brooks, Dennis L.
9261 Piccadilly Circle
Windsor, California 95492 / US
05 / Haarstad, Philip J.
209 Kittery Point
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
06 / Peacock, James C., III
526 East Evelyn Avenue
Sunnyvalle, California 94086 / US
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Gates, Marie Christina Esther , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Gates, Marie Christina Esther , et al
Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2000/41]Gates, Marie Christina Esther , et al
c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2000/37]Walsh, Michael Joseph , et al
TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [1999/13]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date98307396.611.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateUS1997093713024.09.1997         Original published format: US 937130
[1999/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0904745
Date:31.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0904745
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2000/38]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Endoluminale Prothese sowie ihr Verwendungverfahren für abgezweigte Körperlumen[1999/13]
English:Endolumenal prosthesis and method of use in bifurcation regions of body lumens[1999/13]
French:Prothèse endoluminale et méthode d'utilisation au niveau des bifurcations de vaisseaux[1999/13]
Examination procedure10.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
13.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, LI, PT, SE
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
25.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/22]
05.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/22]
Request for further processing for:25.02.2004Request for further processing filed
25.02.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PXY]WO9836709  (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PX] 1-6,8-11,14-17,19,21-23,47-55 * figures 1-12 * * claims 29-31 * * page 6, line 28 - page 9, line 25 * * page 10, line 1 - page 13, line 20 * * page 14, line 13 - line 27 * [Y] 12,24;
 [YA]WO9614028  (DIVYSIO SOLUTIONS LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 12,24 * figures 5-7 * * page 13, line 8 - page 15, line 9 * [A] 47;
 [PXA]WO9819628  (VARDI GIL M [US], et al) [PX] 1,12,13,17,24,25 * figures 1-6 * * page 9, line 14 - page 11, line 13 * * page 12, line 11 - line 23 * * page 13, line 7 - line 14 * [A] 7,18-20;
 [E]EP0897700  (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [E] 1-11,14-23,47-55 * figures 7-36 * * column 14, line 44 - column 15, line 21 * * column 15, line 55 - column 18, line 12 * * column 20, line 3 - column 21, line 37 * * column 22, line 54 - column 23, line 16 *;
 [EA]WO9847446  (BARD GALWAY LTD [IE], et al) [E] 47 * figures 3-5 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 30 * [A] 1,12,13,17,24,25
by applicantUS4580568
 US4733665
 US4739762
 US4776337
 US4830003
 US4913141
 US5019090
 US5292331
 US4969458
    DAVID P. FOLEY ET AL., "BIFURCATION LESION STENTING", THE THORAXCENTRE JOURNAL, (199612), vol. 8, no. 4,
    FREED,M.D. ET AL., THE NEW MANUEL OF INTERVENTIONAL CARDIOLOGY, PHYSICIANS' PRESS, pages 238 - 243,