Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0905643

EP0905643 - Method and system for recognizing handwritten words [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Syeda-Mahmood, Tanveer F.
1 Scarborough Park
Rochester, New York 14625 / US
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]Skone James, Robert Edmund
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98307406.314.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateUS1997093989429.09.1997         Original published format: US 939894
[1999/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0905643
Date:31.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0905643
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zum Erkennen handgeschriebener Wörter[1999/13]
English:Method and system for recognizing handwritten words[1999/13]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour reconnaître des mots manuscrits[1999/13]
Examination procedure23.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
14.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9530965  (MOTOROLA INC) [A] 3,5,7 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4847912  (TANAKA HIDEAKI ET AL) [A] 3,5,7
 [AD]  - YEHEZKEL LAMDAN ET AL, "GEOMETRIC HASHING: A GENERAL AND EFFICIENT MODEL-BASED RECOGNITION SCHEME", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, TAMPA, DEC. 5 - 8, 1988, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19881205), no. CONF. 2, pages 238 - 249, XP000079918 [AD] 1 * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.2] *
 [A]  - SENI G ET AL, "SEGMENTING HANDWRITTEN TEXT LINES INTO WORDS USING DISTANCE ALGORITHMS", MACHINE VISION APPLICATIONS IN CHARACTER RECOGNITION AND INDUSTRIAL INSPECTION, SAN JOSE, FEB. 10 - 12, 1992, D'AMATO D P;ET AL (EDS ), ISBN 0-8194-0815-8, pages 61 - 72, XP000633702 [A] 3,5,7