Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0909008

EP0909008 - Downhole current generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2007  [2007/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas, TX 75381-9052 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/09]For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 819052 Dallas
Texas 75381-9052 / US
Former [1999/15]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas, Texas 75381-9052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Skinner, Neal G.
1219 Indian Paint
Lewisville, Texas 75076 / US
02 / Ringgenberg, Paul D.
2101 Brentwood Lane
Carollton, Texas 75006 / US
[1999/15]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/15]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date98307453.515.09.1998
[1999/15]
Priority number, dateUS1997093176216.09.1997         Original published format: US 931762
[1999/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0909008
Date:14.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0909008
Date:12.09.2001
[2001/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0909008
Date:01.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02K7/18, E21B41/00, H02K35/02
[2001/37]
Former International [1999/15]H02K7/18
Designated contracting statesDK,   FR,   GB,   NL [2002/23]
Former [1999/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stromgenerator zur Verwendung im Bohrloch[1999/15]
English:Downhole current generator[1999/15]
French:Générateur de courant pour fond de puits[1999/15]
Examination procedure21.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/10]
12.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2005Fee for grant paid
23.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9701018  (BAKER HUGHES INC) [X] 1-4,10,11 * page 16, line 1 - page 17, line 2; figure 7A; claims 29,32 *;
 [X]US4491738  (KAMP ANTHONY-WILLEM) [X] 1-6,10-12 * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 25; figures 2A,2B,4 * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 24 *;
 [A]US5146123  (YARR GEORGE A) [A] 7-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 38 *