EP0908806 - Global positioning system self calibration attitude determination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Space Systems/Loral, Inc. 3825 Fabian Way Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states Space Systems/Loral, Inc. 3825 Fabian Way Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuller, Richard A. 952 Castlewood Drive No. 1 Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | 02 /
Rodden, John J. 2071 Robin Hood Lane Los Altos, California 94020 / US | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1999/15] | Vaufrouard, John Charles Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307525.0 | 16.09.1998 | [1999/15] | Priority number, date | US19970059092P | 16.09.1997 Original published format: US 59092 P | US19980144146 | 31.08.1998 Original published format: US 144146 | [1999/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0908806 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0908806 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/08, G01S5/02 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
G01S19/55 (EP,US);
B64G1/244 (EP,US);
B64G1/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/15] | G05D1/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/24] |
Former [1999/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GPS-Lagebestimmung mit Selbstkalibrierung | [1999/15] | English: | Global positioning system self calibration attitude determination | [1999/15] | French: | Détermination d'attitude par GPS utilisant de l'autocalibration | [1999/15] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 10.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5296861 (KNIGHT DONALD T [US]) [A] 1,4,7 * column 4, line 6 - line 65 * * column 16, line 20 - line 65 *; | [A]US5548293 (COHEN CLARK E [US]) [A] 1,4,7 * column 3, line 30 - line 61 *; | [A]EP0777128 (MATRA MARCONI SPACE FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1,4,7 * the whole document * |