Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0912081

EP0912081 - Modular electronic system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/17]Adaptable case and a modular electronic system
[2004/07]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.03.2005  [2005/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roberts Technologies PLC
103 Temple Street
Bristol BS99 7UD / GB
[1999/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Roberts, Paul Nicholas
1 Hawthorn Heights
Worle, Weston Super Mare BS22 9EZ / GB
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Wardle, Callum Tarn , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/11]Wardle, Callum Tarn , et al
Withers & Rogers Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [1999/17]Beck, Simon Antony , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date98307767.824.09.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateGB1997002044225.09.1997         Original published format: GB 9720442
[1999/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0912081
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0912081
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/14, H05K5/00, G06F1/18, G11B33/02, G11B33/12
[2000/09]
Former International [1999/17]H05K7/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Modulares elektronisches System[2004/07]
English:Modular electronic system[2004/07]
French:Système électronique modulaire[2004/07]
Former [1999/17]Anwenbares Gehäuse und modulares elektronisches System
Former [1999/17]Adaptable case and a modular electronic system
Former [1999/17]Boîtier adaptable et système électronique modulaire
Examination procedure14.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
24.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY
16.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/12]
22.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/12]
Request for further processing for:30.09.2003Request for further processing filed
30.09.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9614614  (NEOMAN HANY [GB]) [A] 1,2,4-6,9 * page 7, line 1 - page 7, line 4 * * page 9, line 11 - page 9, line 13 * * figures 1,6 *;
 [A]US5435737  (HAGA DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *