Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0904749

EP0904749 - Joint prosthesis having controlled rotation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.06.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.08.2005  [2005/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DePuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
DePuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
Depuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Professional, Inc.
325 Paramount Drive
Raynham, Massachusetts 02767 / US
Inventor(s)01 / O'Neil, Michael J.
1588 Old Kings Highway
West Barnstable, MA 02668 / US
02 / Oyola, Arnold
450 Somerset Avenue, Apt. 508
Taunton, MA 02780 / US
03 / Cheal, Edward J.
30 Headwaters Lane
Duxbury, MA 02332 / US
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Fisher, Adrian John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]Fisher, Adrian John
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98307769.424.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateUS1997093692525.09.1997         Original published format: US 936925
[1999/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0904749
Date:31.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0904749
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0904749
Date:11.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/37]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gelenkprothese mit kontrollierter Drehbewegung[1999/13]
English:Joint prosthesis having controlled rotation[1999/13]
French:Prothèse d' articulation à rotation contrôlée[1999/13]
Examination procedure09.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
07.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2004Fee for grant paid
10.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31]
Request for further processing for:28.02.2003Request for further processing filed
28.02.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.03.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5011496  (FORTE MARK R [US], et al) [A] 1,15,16 * abstract *;
 [AD]US5489311  (CIPOLLETTI GEORGE B [US]) [AD] 1,15,16 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2601873  (CUILLERON J [FR]) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 1,7 *;
 [A]EP0732091  (PAPPAS MICHAEL J [US]) [A] * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 6; figures 25-27 *;
 [A]US5413608  (KELLER ARNOLD [DE]) [A] * abstract *
by applicantUS4219893
 US4301553
 US5059216
 US5071438
 US5171283
 US5489311