EP0913891 - Electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okura, Yoshio c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-ken, Mie / JP | 02 /
Ito, Hikaru c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-ken, Mie / JP | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307771.0 | 24.09.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | JP19970269008 | 01.10.1997 Original published format: JP 26900897 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913891 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0913891 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913891 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
H01R13/62933 (EP,US);
H01R13/5202 (EP,US);
H01R13/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/10] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder | [1999/18] | English: | Electrical connector | [1999/18] | French: | Connecteur électrique | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 21.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.05.2003 | GB | 24.09.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/45] | GB | 24.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5230635 (TAKENOUCHI KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 15, line 62 - column 16, line 57; figure 27 *; | [A]US5263871 (SANO YUKIHARU [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 12 - column 6, line 19; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]JPH0587844U (SUMITOMO) [AD] 1 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0611867 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 15; figures 1,6-8 *; | [A]US3146052 (BURCH DONALD C, et al); | [A]US3292133 (BURCH DONALD C, et al) |