Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0904750

EP0904750 - Rotatable joint prosthesis with axial securement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.02.2007  [2007/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DePuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/10]For all designated states
Depuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
DePuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
Depuy Products, Inc.
700 Orthopaedic Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Professional, Inc.
325 Paramount Drive
Raynham, Massachusetts 02767 / US
Inventor(s)01 / O'Neil, Michael J.
1588 Old Kings Highway
West Barnstable, MA 02668 / US
02 / Oyola, Arnold
450 Somerset Avenue, Apt. 508
Taunton, MA 02780 / US
03 / Cheal, Edward J.
30 Headwaters Lane
Duxbury, MA 02332 / US
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Fisher, Adrian John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]Fisher, Adrian John
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98307772.824.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateUS1997093638325.09.1997         Original published format: US 936383
[1999/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0904750
Date:31.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0904750
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0904750
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/37]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drehbare Gelenkprothese mit axialer Fixierung[1999/13]
English:Rotatable joint prosthesis with axial securement[1999/13]
French:Prothèse d' articulation rotative à fixation axiale[1999/13]
Examination procedure13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
28.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2005Fee for grant paid
21.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US5011496  (FORTE MARK R [US], et al) [A] 1,9,19,21 * abstract *;
 [AD]US5489311  (CIPOLLETTI GEORGE B [US]) [AD] 1,9,19,21 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0732091  (PAPPAS MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 4,19,21 * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 6; figures 25-27 *;
 [A]FR2601873  (CUILLERON J [FR]) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 1,7 *;
 [A]US5413608  (KELLER ARNOLD [DE]) [A] * abstract *
ExaminationUS4470158
by applicantUS4219893
 US4301553
 US5059216
 US5071438
 US5171283
 US5489311