Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0908957

EP0908957 - Image sensing apparatus, signal detection apparatus, and signal accumulation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2009/09]
Former [1999/15]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Koizumi, Toru, c/o Canon K.K.
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Kochi, Tetsunobu c/o Canon K.K.
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1999/15]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [1999/15]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98307952.630.09.1998
[1999/15]
Priority number, dateJP1997027257806.10.1997         Original published format: JP 27257897
[1999/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0908957
Date:14.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0908957
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0908957
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/148, H04N3/15
[1999/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/50]
Former [1999/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bildaufnahme-, Signaldetektion- und Signalakkumulierungsvorrichtung[1999/15]
English:Image sensing apparatus, signal detection apparatus, and signal accumulation apparatus[1999/15]
French:Dispositif capteur d'image, détecteur de signal et d'accumulation de charges[1999/15]
Examination procedure17.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
11.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2009Fee for grant paid
05.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Request for further processing for:29.09.2004Request for further processing filed
29.09.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.10.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
FR30.09.2009
[2011/28]
Former [2010/44]NL25.02.2009
FR30.09.2009
Former [2010/05]NL25.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0905788  (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 1-17 * page 15, line 21 - line 53; figure 18 *;
 [E]WO9856168  (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [E] 1-17 * page 3, line 15 - page 5, line 1; figure 1 *;
 [E]US5898168  (GOWDA SUDHIR MUNISWAMY [US], et al) [E] 1-17 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 62; figure 3B *