Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0904779

EP0904779 - Iontophoretic patch with hydrogel reservoir [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vyteris, Inc.
13-01 Pollitt Drive Fair Lawn
New Jersey 07410-2700 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
Vyteris, Inc.
13-01 Pollitt Drive
Fair Lawn, New Jersey 07410-2700 / US
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kupperblatt, Gary B
8 Richard Drive
Flanders, NJ 07836 / US
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Samuels, Lucy Alice , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/40]Samuels, Lucy Alice , et al
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1999/13]Ruffles, Graham Keith
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date98307962.530.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateUS1997094174630.09.1997         Original published format: US 941746
[1999/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0904779
Date:31.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0904779
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0904779
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/70, A61N1/30
[1999/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Iontophoretisches Pflaster mit einem Hydrogelreservoir[2004/32]
English:Iontophoretic patch with hydrogel reservoir[1999/13]
French:Patch iontophorétique avec un réservoir d' hydrogel[1999/13]
Former [1999/13]Iontophoretisches pflaster mit einem hydrogelreservoir
Examination procedure20.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
01.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI
18.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
30.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2004Fee for grant paid
11.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Request for further processing for:03.03.2004Request for further processing filed
02.03.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.03.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9509670  (RUTGERS, THE STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW JERSEY) [Y] 1-4,7,8 * page 3, line 20 - page 8, line 45 * * page 10, line 19 - page 12, line 25 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0509122  (KOREA RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1-4,7,8 * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 41 * * page 5, line 2 - line 11 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9527529  (ALZA CORPORATION) [A] 1-10 * page 40 - page 41; example 6 * * page 40, line 17 - line 18 *;
 [A]US3987163  (RANKIN) [A] 6,9,10 * claims 1,4 *;
 [PX]WO9808492  (NOVO NORDISK A/S) [PX] 1-5,7,8 * page 35, line 16 - line 32 * * page 38, line 30 - page 39, line 34 *