Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993137

EP0993137 - CDMA communication system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/15]Communication system
[2005/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cao, Qiang
23 Castlefield Close
Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 7EG / GB
02 / Lin, Jie
51 Capesthorne Drive
Swindon, Wiltshire SN2 3UP / GB
03 / Lim, Seau Sian
17 Union Street
Swindon, Wiltshire SN1 3LD / GB
04 / Stanton, James Leslie
19 Greenwood Drive
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8SY / GB
05 / Reader, David Jonathan
1A Clarence Road
London W4 3AS / GB
06 / Freiberg, Lorenz Fred
17 Cabot Drive
Swindon, Wilts SN5 6HG / GB
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Williams, David John , et al
Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd
Unit 18, Core 3
Workzone
Innova Business Park, Electric Avenue
Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Williams, David John , et al
Lucent Technologies UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date98308091.205.10.1998
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993137
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993137
Date:21.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04J13/02
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2005/11]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:CDMA Kommunikationssystem und Verfahren[2005/07]
English:CDMA communication system and method[2005/07]
French:Système et procédé de communications AMRC[2005/07]
Former [2000/15]Kommunikationssystem
Former [2000/15]Communication system
Former [2000/15]Système de communications
Examination procedure15.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
13.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT
17.05.2005Fee for grant paid
17.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.02.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
07.02.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI21.12.2005
IT21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
[2008/15]
Former [2006/34]FI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
Former [2006/27]FI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/24]FI21.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9523464  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * page 1, lines 8-10 * * page 4, lines 12-30 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 6 * * page 7, lines 1-12 * * page 9, lines 15-28 *;
 [X]EP0600713  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1,4,8 * column 1, lines 1-4 * * column 1, lines 33-49 * * column 6, lines 22-42 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 6 * * column 7, lines 29-44 *;
 [A]US5619491  (PANZER HERBERT DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * column 1, lines 5-11 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, lines 14-18 * * column 4, lines 45-63 * * column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 27 *