Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992640

EP0992640 - Method and device for the decoration of coving [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.2001
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2001 [2001/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mowat-Maconochie, Robin
Whitings Cottage, Clapton Row Bourton-on-the-Water
Gloucestershire / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Mowat-Maconochie, Robin
Whitings Cottage, Clapton Row
Bourton-on-the-Water, Gloucestershire / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Carter, Gerald
Arthur R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square
Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB
[2000/15]
Application number, filing date98308232.209.10.1998
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992640
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:E04F19/04
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/51]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Dekoration von Leisten[2000/15]
English:Method and device for the decoration of coving[2000/15]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la décoration de listeaux[2000/15]
Examination procedure13.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/31]
07.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/31]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2291898  (HARRISON KENNETH [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,10 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 30; figures 1-8 * [A] 11,16;
 [A]US5463835  (WOOD JAMES [US]) [A] 1,4,6,10,16 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-4; examples 1,2 *;
 [A]US3778945  (MEDOW R) [A] 1,7,16 * column 2, line 32 - line 67 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 49; figures 1,5,9 *;
 [A]US3708804  (SANTOS M)
by applicantGB2240561
 GB2243848
 GB2275701