Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0992595 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0992595



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 62
09.07.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.07.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.05.2002 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 1
17.05.2002 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
30.04.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.04.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
25.03.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
18.03.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.02.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
28.02.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.02.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
12.01.2001 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
09.11.2000 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
30.05.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
28.01.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.01.1999 European search report Search / examination 2
21.12.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
21.12.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.11.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.10.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.10.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
09.10.1998 Description Search / examination 6
09.10.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.10.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
09.10.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.10.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6