blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0992595


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.07.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
19.07.2002 (Expected) grant published on  04.09.2002  [2002/36]
28.06.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant
20.03.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.02.2002 First examination report
21.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant
22.10.2001 Renewal fee
20.04.2001 Loss of particular rights
09.01.2001 Loss of particular rights
02.01.2001 Change - extension states
08.11.2000 Renewal fee
07.11.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
03.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
09.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  26.07.2000 [2000/30]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]