blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0992595

Designated contracting states BE 
 DE 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 LU 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure17.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
European patent granted04.09.2002
Opposition procedure05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 27.08.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:26.07.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000526
 
Event date:20.12.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE
 
Event date:10.04.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020228
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:30.09.2002 
Event description:BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS
Owner Name:*HECKETT MULTISERV P.L.C.HARSCO HOUSE, REGENT PARK
 
Event date:10.10.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69807698
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20021010
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:27.12.2002 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:01.03.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2182232 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:28.03.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CA
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF ADDRESS
 
Event date:27.08.2003 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20030605
 
Event date:31.10.2003 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20031031
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:01.05.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050501
 
Event date:01.07.2005 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20050501
 
Event date:19.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:25.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:25.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20171025
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20171027
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20171025
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20171102
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20171027
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20171027
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20171024
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20171027
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:09.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69807698 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:24.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20181008
 
Event date:04.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:05.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20181009
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20181008