Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992595

EP0992595 - Additives for steelmaking in electric arc furnaces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HECKETT MULTISERV PLC
Commonwealth House, 2 Chalkhill Road Hammersmith
London W6 8DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
HECKETT MULTISERV PLC
Commonwealth House, 2 Chalkhill Road
Hammersmith, London W6 8DW / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Shaw, Daniel Jonathan, c/o Heckett Multiserv Plc
Commonwealth House, 2 Chalkhill Road, Hammersmith
London W6 8DW / GB
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Shaw, Laurence
HLBBshaw, 1 Hagley Road Edgebaston
Birmingham B16 8TG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Shaw, Laurence
Laurence Shaw & Associates, 5th Floor Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road
Edgbaston, Birmingham B16 8TG / GB
Application number, filing date98308246.209.10.1998
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992595
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992595
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C22B1/243, C22B1/14, C22B7/00, C22B7/02
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/51]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zusatzstoff für die Stahlerzeugung in Elektrolichtbogenöfen[2000/15]
English:Additives for steelmaking in electric arc furnaces[2000/15]
French:Additif pour la production d' acier dans un four à arc[2000/15]
Examination procedure26.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
13.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, MC, PT
28.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2002Fee for grant paid
17.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DYX]EP0499779  (RHEINISCHE BRAUNKOHLENW AG [DE], et al) [DY] 1-4,6,7 * claims 1-3,11,12,22 * [X] 5,9;
 [Y]GB1252871  (VÖEST AG) [Y] 1,4 * claims 1,2 *;
 [Y]JPS6075528  ;
 [Y]DE2907537  (FIAT RICERCHE) [Y] 3 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]JPS55158236  ;
 [XD]NL9002165  (LUBO BV MASCHF) [XD] 3 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US4601832  (HOOYKAAS CAREL W J [NL]) [A] 9 * claim 4 *;
 [A]JPS59107036  ;
 [A]US4585475  (FOSNACHT DONALD R [US]) [A] 1,5,10 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4331159  (FUENDERS DIETER DR ING [DE]) [A] * claims 1-6,18-21 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850829), vol. 009, no. 211, Database accession no. (C - 300), [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810225), vol. 005, no. 031, Database accession no. (C - 045), [Y] 1,6,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841009), vol. 008, no. 222, Database accession no. (C - 246), [A] 9-11 * abstract *