Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0913957

EP0913957 - Power control for mobile wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  30.12.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/18]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cao, Qiang
45 Parker Street
Watford, Hertfordshire WD2 5EY / GB
02 / Freiberg, Lorenz Fred
16 Bradenham Road
Grange Park, Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 6EB / GB
03 / Reader, David Jonathan
22 Marney Road
Grange Park, Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 6AW / GB
[1999/18]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2005/25]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2001/17]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [1999/18]Williams, David John , et al
Lucent Technologies UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date98308324.713.10.1998
[1999/18]
Priority number, dateEP1997030874431.10.1997         Original published format: EP 97308744
[1999/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0913957
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005
[1999/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/03]
Former [1999/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leistungsregelung für Mobilfunksystem[1999/18]
English:Power control for mobile wireless communication system[1999/18]
French:Commande de puissance pour un système de communication mobile sans fil[1999/18]
Examination procedure21.10.1999Examination requested  [1999/50]
03.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2002Date of oral proceedings
06.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/07]
06.05.2002Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.11.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/07]
Appeal following examination27.05.2002Appeal received No.  T0831/02
19.07.2002Statement of grounds filed
24.11.2005Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
24.11.2005Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:18.01.2001Request for further processing filed
29.01.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
19.03.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP0682418  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [XD] 1,5,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5604730  (TIEDEMANN JR EDWARD G) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US5204970  (STENGEL ROBERT E ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 8 *;
 [A]US5623484  (MUSZYNSKI PETER) [A] 1-15 * abstract *