EP0911295 - Clamp assembly with automatic rotation control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASCADE CORPORATION 2201 N.E. 201st Avenue Portland Oregon 97230 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states CASCADE CORPORATION 2201 N.E. 201st Avenue Portland Oregon 97230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seaberg, Richard D. 18425 N.E. 136th Street Brush Prairie, Washington 98606 / US | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Hill, Richard, et al Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Hill, Richard, et al Wilson Gunn Skerrett, Charles House, 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [1999/17] | Skerrett, John Norton Haigh, et al H.N. & W.S. SKERRETT Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308460.9 | 15.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | US19970956695 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: US 956695 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911295 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911295 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911295 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/18, B66F9/12 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
B66F9/184 (EP,US);
B66F9/125 (EP,US);
Y10S414/124 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/17] | B66F9/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, IT, SE [2001/36] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Klemmvorrichtung mit automatischer Rotationssteuerung | [1999/17] | English: | Clamp assembly with automatic rotation control | [1999/17] | French: | Assemblage de pince à commande de rotation automatique | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05008044.9 / EP1555239 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH05238692 ; | [XAY]US2287469 (COCHRAN CLYDE E) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,6 [Y] 5; | [XA]US2541268 (MILZ HAROLD E) [X] 1 * column 4, line 44 - column 8, line 12 * [A] 2,5,6; | [A]US4177000 (MCCART LARRY D [US], et al); | [Y]US4742468 (OHASHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 59 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931220), vol. 017, no. 697, Database accession no. (M - 1532), & JP05238692 A 19930917 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,5,6 |