Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0915632

EP0915632 - Adaptive frequency channel assignment based on battery power level in wireless access protocols [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.09.2011
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.10.2011  [2011/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1999/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Agrawal, Prathima
40 Colchester Road
New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US
02 / Kishore, Shalinee
4 Issac Drive
Dayton, New Jersey 08817 / US
03 / Sivalingam, Krishna M.
100 NW Terreview Dr. (Apt.F28)
Pullman, Washington 99163 / US
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
4220 Nash Court
Oxford Business Park South
Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date98308466.616.10.1998
[1999/19]
Priority number, dateUS1997095539121.10.1997         Original published format: US 955391
[1999/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0915632
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0915632
Date:18.10.2000
[2000/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04Q7/30, H04Q7/32, H04Q7/22
[2000/42]
Former International [1999/19]H04Q7/38, H04Q7/30, H04Q7/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/27]
Former [1999/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Adaptive Kanalfrequenzzuteilung auf Basis von Batterieladungshöhe in schnurlosen Zugriffsprotokollen[1999/19]
English:Adaptive frequency channel assignment based on battery power level in wireless access protocols[1999/19]
French:Allocation adaptative de fréquence de canal en fonction du niveau de batterie pour protocoles d'accès sans fil[1999/19]
Examination procedure29.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
14.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/43]
10.06.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/43]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
05.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
07.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
07.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201013   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9509512  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-8,12,13,17-19 * page 8, line 22 - page 11, line 7 *;
 [Y]US5666649  (DENT PAUL W [SE]) [Y] 1,2,6-8,12,13,17-19 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 12 *;
 [A]US5428815  (GRUBE GARY W [US]);
 [E]US6072784  (AGRAWAL PRATHIMA [US], et al) [E] 1,3-6,8-17,19-22 * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 14 * * column 13, line 36 - column 14, line 47 *