Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996237

EP0996237 - Timing estimation for GSM bursts based on previously determined average values [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/17]Timing estimation for GMS bursts based on previously determined average values
[2003/03]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zhou, Hai
3 Boleyn Close, Grange Park
Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 6JZ / GB
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London
WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [2000/17]Williams, David John , et al
Lucent Technologies UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date98308514.319.10.1998
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996237
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996237
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005, H04L25/03, H04L7/04
[2003/03]
Former International [2000/17]H04B7/005, H04L25/03
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/01]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zeitabschätzung für GSM-Bursts auf Grundlage zuvor ermittelter Durchschnittswerte[2000/17]
English:Timing estimation for GSM bursts based on previously determined average values[2003/03]
French:Estimation de temps de rafales GSM à la base de valeurs moyennes déterminées au préalable[2000/17]
Former [2000/17]Timing estimation for GMS bursts based on previously determined average values
Examination procedure11.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
27.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2003Fee for grant paid
15.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
03.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.05.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI04.02.2004
IT04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
[2008/15]
Former [2004/46]FI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9418752  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * page 5, line 18 - page 10, line 38; figures 2-6 *;
 [Y]US4669091  (NOSSEN EDWARD J [US]) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * column 18, line 35 - line 61; figure 14 *;
 [A]US5648991  (NAMEKATA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * column 5, line 1 - line 65; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5740206  (LOMP GARY R [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6