Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0911939

EP0911939 - Battery charging device and method and electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/21]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujii, Kenichi, Fujitsu Personal Computer Sys. Ltd
1405, Ooaza Oomaru
Inagi-shi, Tokyo, 206-0801 / JP
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Hitching, Peter Matthew
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date98308531.719.10.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateJP1997028734020.10.1997         Original published format: JP 28734097
JP1998015326702.06.1998         Original published format: JP 15326798
[1999/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0911939
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0911939
Date:16.08.2000
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0911939
Date:24.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00
[1999/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/18]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Batterieladevorrichtung und -verfahren sowie elektronische Einrichtung[1999/17]
English:Battery charging device and method and electronic device[1999/17]
French:Dispositif et méthode de chargement de batterie et dispositif électronique[1999/17]
Examination procedure18.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
04.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2006Fee for grant paid
20.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[AD]JPH06303729  ;
 [A]US2506340  (BUCKLEY JOSEPH J) [A] 1-37 * column 1, line 11 - line 36 *;
 [A]JPH09103033  ;
 [A]US4246529  (JURGENS GUNTER R, et al) [A] 1-37 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - line 17 *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, [AD] 1-37 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, [A] 1-37 * abstract *