Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018816

EP1018816 - Accumulative ARQ method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2001
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.11.2001 [2001/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Demetrescu, Cristian
2 Truro Path
Swindon, Wilts SN5 8JZ / GB
02 / Luschi, Carlo
15 Sadler Walk
Oxford, Oxfordshire 0X1 1TX / GB
03 / Sandell, Magnus
13 Shelley Street
Swindon, Wilts SN1 3PN / GB
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Williams, David John , et al
Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd
Unit 18, Core 3
Workzone
Innova Business Park, Electric Avenue
Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Williams, David John , et al
Lucent Technologies UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date98308548.119.10.1998
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018816
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18
[2000/28]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/12]
Former [2000/28]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anhäufende ARQ-verfahren und -vorrichtung[2000/28]
English:Accumulative ARQ method and system[2000/28]
French:Procédé et système ARQ cumulatif[2000/28]
Examination procedure13.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/47]
18.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/47]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.02.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9837660  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1-8,13-15 * page 7, line 12 - line 25 * * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 34 * * page 11, line 9 - line 27 * * figure 6 * [Y] 9,11,12;
 [XY]US5568513  (CROFT THOMAS M [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,13-15 * column 5, line 1 - column 7, line 67 * [Y] 9,11,12;
 [Y]EP0729254  (ALCATEL NV [NL], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract *;
 [Y]  METZNER JOHN J ; CHUNG JONG-MOON, "Efficient energy utilization with a time constraint and time varying channels", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, ISCE'97, Singapore, Singapore, (19971202), pages 183 - 186, XP002101854 [Y] 11,12 * abstract * * section 1 *
 [AD]  CHASE D, "Code Combining - A Maximum-Likelihood Decoding Approach for Combining an Arbitrary Number of Noisy Packets", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (19850524), vol. 33, no. 5, pages 385 - 393, XP002091628 [AD] 1,14 * section II *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1985.1096314
 [A]  HONG ZHOU ET AL, "A HYBRID ARQ SCHEME WITH DIVERSITY COMBINING FOR LAND MOBILE RADIO", FROM PIONEERS TO THE 21ST. CENTURY, DENVER, MAY 10 - 13, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920510), vol. 2, no. CONF. 42, pages 902 - 905, XP000339927 [A] 1,14 * section 2.1 *