blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0911723 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0911723



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1029
26.10.2012 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.11.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.11.2011 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
04.11.2011 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
04.11.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
29.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
29.09.2011 Drawings Search / examination 1
29.09.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 12
29.09.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 11
29.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.09.2011 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
02.08.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.08.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
02.08.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.08.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 112
20.04.2011 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
24.02.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 18
24.02.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
03.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.12.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 4
03.12.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
03.12.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 1
10.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
10.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
10.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 19
10.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 19
10.11.2010 Claims Appeal 14
10.11.2010 Claims Appeal 14
10.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
10.11.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 6
21.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.10.2010 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
11.10.2010 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
06.10.2010 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 3
04.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.09.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 14
07.06.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.07.2009 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
17.07.2008 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Appeal 15
15.07.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
11.07.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 5
08.07.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 5
29.01.2008 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.01.2008 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
02.05.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
05.01.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
15.12.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.11.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
15.11.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
11.09.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
07.09.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.07.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
14.07.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
06.07.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
06.07.2006 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
06.07.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
06.07.2006 Means of redress Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
06.07.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.06.2006 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
23.05.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.05.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.05.2006 Annex Search / examination 3
02.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 7
02.05.2006 Description Search / examination 19
02.05.2006 Description Search / examination 19
02.05.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
28.04.2006 Annex Search / examination 3
28.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 7
28.04.2006 Description Search / examination 19
28.04.2006 Description Search / examination 19
28.04.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
13.02.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.02.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.02.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
06.02.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.01.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.07.2005 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 3
23.09.2004 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
30.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
30.07.2004 Description Search / examination 3
30.07.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
28.07.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 10
03.06.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
16.03.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.10.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
17.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.07.2003 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
24.07.2001 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.07.2001 Translation of priority document Search / examination 59
24.07.2001 Translation of priority document Search / examination 125
18.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
14.12.1999 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
09.11.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.03.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
07.01.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
07.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 94
07.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 48
20.10.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.10.1998 Claims Search / examination 15
20.10.1998 Description Search / examination 79
20.10.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.10.1998 Drawings Search / examination 23
20.10.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.10.1998 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6