Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0911723

EP0911723 - Printing control apparatus, printing control method, printing control system, and storage medium in which printing control program is stored [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2012
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.11.2012  [2012/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Osada, Mamoru
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Shimotai, Naoko
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2011/51]
Former [1999/17]01 / Osada, Mamoru
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Shimotai, Naoko
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Ltd
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park
Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB
Former [1999/17]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98308585.320.10.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateJP1997029466527.10.1997         Original published format: JP 29466597
JP1998024175127.08.1998         Original published format: JP 24175198
[1999/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0911723
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0911723
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0911723
Date:21.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/12
[1999/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/51]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drucksteuerungsgerät, Drucksteuerverfahren, Drucksteuerungssystem und Speichermedium, in dem Drucksteuerungsprogramm gespeichert ist[1999/17]
English:Printing control apparatus, printing control method, printing control system, and storage medium in which printing control program is stored[1999/17]
French:Appareil de commande d'impression, méthode de commande d'impression, système de commande d'impression et médium de stockage dans lequel un programme de commande d'impression est stocké[1999/17]
Examination procedure24.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
17.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2006Date of oral proceedings
06.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
06.07.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2011Fee for grant paid
29.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination07.09.2006Appeal received No.  T1931/06
15.11.2006Statement of grounds filed
10.12.2010Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
10.12.2010Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.10.2003
Opposition(s)24.09.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48]
Request for further processing for:28.07.2004Request for further processing filed
28.07.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.09.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
02.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
02.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]US5428747  (KITAMOTO TORU [JP]) [X] 1,2,18,19,34,35,50,51 * figures 1,9 * * column 4, line 64 - column 6, line 15 * * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 16 *;
 [A]EP0653700  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12,17-25,27-29,33-41,43-45,49-51 * figures 2,14,20,22-24,27,56-58,60 * * column 9, line 1 - column 11, line 26 * * column 18, line 14 - line 29 * * column 25, line 40 - column 29, line 44 * * column 58, line 47 - column 61, line 26 * * column 62, line 30 - column 64, line 9 *