Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0912051

EP0912051 - Method for using audio and video devices and audio and video device system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/26]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Akamatsu, Chiyo
250-33 Shimokuratacyo, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanawaga-ken / JP
02 / Hasegawa, Tsukasa
3, Goten-2-chome
Hiratsuka-shi / JP
03 / Ito, Tamotsu
4-6503, Kamitsuchidana Minami-3-chome
Ayase-shi / JP
04 / Goto, Hidefumi
7-2-B201, Nagasawa-2-chome
Yokosuka-shi / JP
05 / Noguchi, Takaharu
884-1-135, Kamikuratacho, Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi / JP
06 / Ohara, Yasunori
391-2-401, Tabiko
Hitachinaka-shi / JP
 [2006/08]
Former [1999/39]01 / Akamatsu, Chiyo
250-33 Shimokuratacyo, Totsuka-ku
Yokoham-shi, Kanawaga-ken / JP
02 / Hasegawa, Tsukasa
3, Goten-2-chome
Hiratsuka-shi / JP
03 / Ito, Tamotsu
4-6503, Kamitsuchidana Minami-3-chome
Ayase-shi / JP
04 / Goto, Hidefumi
7-2-B201, Nagasawa-2-chome
Yokosuka-shi / JP
05 / Noguchi, Takaharu
884-1-135, Kamikuratacho, Totsuka-ku
Yokhama-shi / JP
06 / Ohara, Yasunori
391-2-401, Tabiko
Hitachinaka-shi / JP
Former [1999/17]01 / Akamatsu, Chiyo
1545-424, Yoshidacho, Tozsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi / JP
02 / Hasegawa, Tsukasa
3, Goten-2-chome
Hiratsuka-shi / JP
03 / Ito, Tamotsu
4-6503, Kamitsuchidana Minami-3-chome
Ayase-shi / JP
04 / Goto, Hidefumi
7-2-B201, Nagasawa-2-chome
Yokosuka-shi / JP
05 / Noguchi, Takaharu
884-1-135, Kamikuratacho, Totsuka-ku
Yokhama-shi / JP
06 / Ohara, Yasunori
391-2-401, Tabiko
Hitachinaka-shi / JP
Representative(s)Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98308590.321.10.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateJP1997028991022.10.1997         Original published format: JP 28991097
JP1997033679608.12.1997         Original published format: JP 33679697
[1999/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0912051
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0912051
Date:04.04.2001
[2001/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0912051
Date:28.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP13.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/782, H04N5/765, H04N5/775
[2000/52]
Former International [1999/17]H04N5/782
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2002/02]
Former [2002/01]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anwendungsverfahren für Audio- und Videogeräte sowie Audio- und Videogerätesystem[1999/17]
English:Method for using audio and video devices and audio and video device system[1999/17]
French:Procédé pour utiliser des dispositifs de son et d'image, et système de dispositif de son et d'image[1999/17]
Examination procedure10.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/17]
17.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2006Fee for grant paid
12.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23]
Request for further processing for:26.01.2005Request for further processing filed
26.01.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.02.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
24.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0756276  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,11,12,18-24 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9736422  (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,11,12,18-24 * abstract *
 [A]  RICHARDS R, "A NEW AUDIO, VIDEO AND CONTROL INTERCONNECTION STANDARD FOR CONSUMER ELECTRONIC DEVICES", DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMERELECTRONICS (ICCE),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19940621), ISBN 0-7803-1454-9, pages 258 - 259, XP000504043 [A] 1,11,12,18-24 * the whole document *