Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0918344

EP0918344 - Switch device and electronic devices using the switch device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku
Tokyo 145 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho
Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawase, Tatsuaki
1-1-17 Saiwai-cho
Furukawa-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP
02 / Kuroda, Yoshimasa
3-9-9 Nakazato
Furukawa-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP
[1999/21]
Representative(s)Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB
Application number, filing date98308678.623.10.1998
[1999/21]
Priority number, dateJP1997031945820.11.1997         Original published format: JP 31945897
JP1998022165405.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22165498
[1999/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0918344
Date:26.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0918344
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0918344
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01H25/00
[1999/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/01]
Former [1999/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schalter und elektronisches Gerät das diesen Schalter verwendet[2003/19]
English:Switch device and electronic devices using the switch device[1999/21]
French:Interrupteur et dispositifs électroniques utilisant cet interrupteur[1999/21]
Former [1999/21]Schalter und Elektronisches Gerät die dieser Schalter verwendet
Examination procedure25.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
10.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2003Fee for grant paid
02.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0278649  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2733085  (ITT COMPOSANTS INSTR [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4314111  (KOBAYASHI MITSUO) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2460457  (DEKORSY GERHARD) [A] 5 * figure - *;
 [A]DE9409478U  (KEMPPI OY [FI]) [A] 1,5 * figure . *