Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0914926

EP0914926 - Process and apparatus for forming plastic sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fields, Steven David
283 Cinnabar Lane
Yardley, Pennsylvania 19067 / US
02 / Galione, James Ralph
215 Franklin St.
Bristol, Pennsylvania 19007 / US
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited
1 King Street
Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Former [1999/37]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon CR9 3NB / GB
Former [1999/19]Tanner, James Percival , et al
ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon CR9 3NB / GB
Application number, filing date98308962.402.11.1998
[1999/19]
Priority number, dateUS1997006464207.11.1997         Original published format: US 64642
[1999/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0914926
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0914926
Date:03.05.2000
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0914926
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29C47/14
[1999/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/02]
Former [1999/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Formen einer Kunststoffplatte[1999/19]
English:Process and apparatus for forming plastic sheet[1999/19]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication de plaques en plastique[1999/19]
Examination procedure30.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/19]
22.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2002Fee for grant paid
09.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US4384015  (KOEPKE GUENTHER [DE], et al) [X] 13 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 5 * * figure 1 * [A] 1 [Y] 7-11;
 [Y]GB1087156  (MOBIL OIL CORP) [Y] 7-11 * page 4, line 98 - line 129; figure 1 *