blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0913622

EP0913622 - Pipe coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GLYNWED PIPE SYSTEMS LIMITED
Headland House, New Coventry Road Sheldon
Birmingham B26 3AZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
GLYNWED PIPE SYSTEMS LIMITED
Headland House, New Coventry Road
Sheldon, Birmingham B26 3AZ / GB
Former [1999/18]For all designated states
GLYNWED PIPE SYSTEMS LIMITED
Headland House, New Coventry Road
Sheldon, Birmingham B26 3AZ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Harper, Brian
17 Gibson Close
Hitchin, Hertfordshire SG4 ORS / GB
[1999/18]
Representative(s)Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/18]Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street
Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Application number, filing date98308964.003.11.1998
[1999/18]
Priority number, dateGB1997002323803.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9723238
[1999/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0913622
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0913622
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0913622
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2000
ClassificationIPC:F16L58/18, F16L25/00, F16L21/08, F16L21/04, F16L55/165
[2000/37]
CPC:
F16L21/08 (EP,US); F16L25/14 (EP,US); F16L58/185 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/18]F16L58/18, F16L25/00, F16L21/08
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/22]
Former [1999/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rohrkupplung[1999/18]
English:Pipe coupling[1999/18]
French:Raccord de tuyaux[1999/18]
Examination procedure09.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
14.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.07.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
14.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2001Fee for grant paid
11.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.04.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE27.03.2002
CH27.03.2002
FR27.03.2002
IT27.03.2002
LI27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
DE28.06.2002
ES25.09.2002
[2008/15]
Former [2006/14]BE27.03.2002
CH27.03.2002
FR27.03.2002
LI27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
DE28.06.2002
ES25.09.2002
Former [2004/04]BE27.03.2002
CH27.03.2002
LI27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
DE28.06.2002
ES25.09.2002
Former [2003/30]BE27.03.2002
CH27.03.2002
LI27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
DE28.06.2002
Former [2003/16]BE27.03.2002
CH27.03.2002
LI27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
Former [2003/06]BE27.03.2002
NL27.03.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0459542  (FORSHEDA AB [SE]) [A] 1-5,9-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4679830  (KOK FRANS J J A [NL]) [A] 1-3,5,9-15 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.