blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0915558

EP0915558 - Quadrature winding retention in a dynamoelectric machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2007
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wright, Kamron Mark
9612 Sea Pines Way
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46819 / US
02 / Molnar, David Thomas
2633 Overbrook Road
Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio 4421-2919 / US
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy, et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]Goode, Ian Roy, et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. Essex House 12-13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date98309048.105.11.1998
[1999/19]
Priority number, dateUS1997096457805.11.1997         Original published format: US 964578
[1999/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0915558
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0915558
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0915558
Date:17.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2001
ClassificationIPC:H02K29/12, H02K3/20
[2002/01]
CPC:
H02K29/12 (EP,US); H02K3/20 (EP,US); H02K15/08 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/19]H02K29/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [2002/38]
Former [1999/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Befestigung einer Quadratwicklung in einer dynamoelektrischen Maschine[1999/19]
English:Quadrature winding retention in a dynamoelectric machine[1999/19]
French:Fixation d'un enroulement en quadrature d'une machine dynamoélectrique[1999/19]
Examination procedure02.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
04.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2006Fee for grant paid
02.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH05103454  ;
 [A]US4481440  (MUELLER ROLF [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [AP]EP0820140  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [AP] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2894157  (MORRILL WAYNE J) [A] 1,10,17 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 15; figure - *;
 [A]US4340829  (MCCOY BILLY R) [A] 1,10,17 * column 6, line 26 - column 7, line 36; figure - *;
 [A]US4386288  (LAURIE WILLIAM H) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 12; figure - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930823), vol. 017, no. 460, Database accession no. (E - 1419), & JP05103454 A 19930423 (ASMO CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.