Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0962875

EP0962875 - Electronic money apparatus, method, card and computer readable record medium having electronic money processing program recorded thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2008
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.12.2008  [2008/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/02]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oneda, Hideo
c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date98309057.205.11.1998
[1999/49]
Priority number, dateJP1998015698005.06.1998         Original published format: JP 15698098
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0962875
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0962875
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0962875
Date:09.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10
[2007/31]
Former International [1999/49]G06F17/60, G07F7/10
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2000/51]
Former [1999/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Apparat, Verfahren und Karte für elektronisches Geld und computerlesbares Speichermedium mit einem Programm zum Verarbeiten von elektronischem Geld[1999/49]
English:Electronic money apparatus, method, card and computer readable record medium having electronic money processing program recorded thereon[1999/49]
French:Appareil, méthode et carte à monnaie électronique et médium de stockage lisible par ordinateur avec un logiciel pour le traitement de monnaies électroniques[1999/49]
Examination procedure27.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
30.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2007Fee for grant paid
22.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.10.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0778691  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-42 * abstract * * column 3, line 35 - column 7, line 36; figures 1-4 * * column 8, line 40 - line 45; claims 1,5 *;
 [Y]JPH09293108  ;
 [A]EP0500956  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,16,31,34,39-42 * abstract *;
 [A]WO8303018  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,16,31,34,39-42 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, [Y] 1-42 * abstract *