Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976987

EP0976987 - Ceiling concealed type air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.05.2005  [2005/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/22]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kanaya, Osamu, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / Nakashima, Hiroshi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / Edayoshi, Atsushi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K:
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / Oya, Ryo, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
05 / Fukushima, Eiji, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Mounteney, Simon James
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date98309159.609.11.1998
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021547430.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21547498
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976987
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976987
Date:18.04.2001
[2001/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976987
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:F24F1/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesES,   GB,   IT [2002/02]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:In die Decke integrierte Klimaanlage[2000/05]
English:Ceiling concealed type air conditioner[2000/05]
French:Dispositif de conditionnement d'air à camoufler dans un plafond[2000/05]
Examination procedure25.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
30.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2004Fee for grant paid
24.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200104   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2002
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0774628  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 6 - column 1, line 52 * * column 5, line 10 - column 5, line 41 * * figures 2,23 *;
 [Y]JPS5845424  ;
 [A]JPS6199051  ;
 [A]GB2155616  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * page 2, line 87 - page 4, line 40 * * claims 1,12,13 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4385505  (UMEZU KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 31 * * column 3, line 53 - column 7, line 2 * * claim 1 * * figures 2,5,6,8 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830603), vol. 007, no. 128, Database accession no. (M - 220), [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1-9 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860919), vol. 010, no. 277, Database accession no. (M - 519), [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *
by applicantJPH06159719