Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968907

EP0968907 - Power saving antitheft control device for a bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.06.2005  [2005/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai
Osaka 590 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai
Osaka 590 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kitamura, Satoshi
16-21 Oji-co 2-cho
Kita-Katsuragi, Nara 636 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Murnane, Graham John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Murnane, Graham John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date98309176.010.11.1998
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1998010945002.07.1998         Original published format: US 109450
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968907
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968907
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968907
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B62H5/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/31]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrrad-Anti-Diebstahlvorrichtung mit Energiesparvorrichtung[2000/01]
English:Power saving antitheft control device for a bicycle[2000/01]
French:Dispositif antivol pour bicyclette avec dispositif pour économiser de l'énergie[2000/01]
Examination procedure26.11.1998Examination requested  [2000/01]
12.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2004Fee for grant paid
10.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]DE9106147U  (LII, JEIN-HEI) [X] 1,2,5-7,9-12,14-28 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 5 * * page 8, line 6 * * figure - *;
 [PX]WO9828509  (ANWYL DAVIES NICHOLAS THOMAS [GB]) [PX] 1-24,26-28 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph L *;
 [E]DE19741643  (KECK KLAUS DR [DE]) [E] 1,2,5-24,26-28 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - line 61 * * column 3, line 18 - line 28 * * column 3, line 46 - line 48 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 44 * * column 7, line 25 - line 31 *;
 [X]FR2757474  (ALLOUCHE JOELLE NICOLE CHANTAL [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4434571  (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,26 * abstract *
ExaminationDE29619966U
by applicantJPH08260784
 EP0869054