Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001432

EP1001432 - Method of testing random-access memory [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kroon, Adriaan
Ouderhoek 70
3632 XG Loenen aan der Vecht / NL
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London
WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Williams, David John , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [2000/20]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date98309192.710.11.1998
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1001432
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11C29/00
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/04]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Prüfungsverfahren eines dynamischen Speichers[2000/20]
English:Method of testing random-access memory[2000/20]
French:Procédé de test d'une mèmoire d'access aleatoire[2000/20]
Examination procedure06.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
31.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/49]
04.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/49]
11.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5699508  (KHASHAYAR ABBAS [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * [A] 3-6