blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0931975

EP0931975 - Light-controlled safety switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.04.2004  [2004/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pem Management, Inc.
Suite 1225, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington
Delaware 19801 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/21]For all designated states
Pem Management, Inc.
Suite 1225, 300 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
Former [1999/30]For all designated states
PENN ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING CORPORATON
P.O. Box 1000
Danboro Pennsylvania 18916 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Oei, Thomas G.
808 South Armour Street
Allentown, PA 18103 / US
02 / Dickert, James R.
5508 Ascot Crescent
Pipersville, PA 18947 / US
03 / Swanstrom, Kenneth A.
2968 Mill Road
Doylestown, PA 18901 / US
04 / Yeh, Edward P.
17 Old Dutch Road
Harleysville, PA 19438 / US
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Evans, Claire
Marks & Clerk
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Evans, Claire
Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BZ / GB
Former [1999/30]Foster, Mark Charles
Edward Evans & Co., Chancery House, 53-64 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1SD / GB
Application number, filing date98309272.712.11.1998
[1999/30]
Priority number, dateUS1998016510002.10.1998         Original published format: US 165100
US19980072306P23.01.1998         Original published format: US 72306 P
US19980086886P27.05.1998         Original published format: US 86886 P
[1999/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0931975
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0931975
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.1999
ClassificationIPC:F16P3/00
[1999/30]
CPC:
F16P3/00 (EP,US); B21J13/00 (EP,US); B21J15/28 (EP,US);
B30B15/285 (EP,US); Y10T408/21 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/14]
Former [1999/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lichtsteuerbare Sicherheitsschaltung[1999/30]
English:Light-controlled safety switch[1999/30]
French:Interrupteur de sécurité commandé par la lumière[1999/30]
Examination procedure26.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
29.01.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.05.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY
30.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2003Fee for grant paid
13.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.03.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH09136195  ;
 [A]EP0046169  (BRAUN AG [DE]);
 [A]US5086965  (MARSTELLER K EDWARD [US], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 097, no. 009, & JP09136195 A 19970527 (ANRITSU CORP) [A] 1,9,10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.