Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0920852

EP0920852 - Keratin fiber strengthening agent and method for strengthening keratin fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.05.2006  [2006/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takasago International Corporation
37-1, Kamata 5-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8721 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]For all designated states
Takasago International Corporation
37-1, Kamata 5-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8721 / JP
Former [1999/23]For all designated states
Takasago International Corporation
19-22, Takanawa 3-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishida, Kenya, Takasago International Corporation
Cent. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata, 1-chome
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Sakurai, Kazutoshi, c/o Takasago Int. Corp.
Cent. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata, 1-chome
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Ogura, Miharu, c/o Takasago Int. Corp.
Cent. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata, 1-chome
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Yamasaki, Tetsuro, c/o Takasago Int. Corp.
Cent. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata, 1-chome
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
05 / Shiroyama, Kenichiro, c/o Takasago Int. Corp.
Cent. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata, 1-chome
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/39]
Former [1999/23]01 / Ishida, Kenya, Takasago Int. Corp.
Cent. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata, 1-chome
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Sakurai, Kazutoshi, c/o Takasago Int. Corp.
Cent. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata, 1-chome
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Ogura, Miharu, c/o Takasago Int. Corp.
Cent. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata, 1-chome
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Yamasaki, Tetsuro, c/o Takasago Int. Corp.
Cent. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata, 1-chome
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
05 / Shiroyama, Kenichiro, c/o Takasago Int. Corp.
Cent. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata, 1-chome
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
Representative(s)Bubb, Antony John Allen , et al
Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Bubb, Antony John Allen , et al
GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
Application number, filing date98309428.518.11.1998
[1999/23]
Priority number, dateJP1997033231918.11.1997         Original published format: JP 33231997
[1999/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0920852
Date:09.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0920852
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0920852
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/06
[1999/23]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/44]
Former [1999/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Keratin-Faser Verstärkungsmittel und Methode zur Verstärkung von Keratin-Fasern[1999/23]
English:Keratin fiber strengthening agent and method for strengthening keratin fiber[1999/23]
French:Agent renforçant les fibres kératiniques et méthode pour renforcer les fibres kératiniques[1999/23]
Examination procedure26.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
22.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2005Fee for grant paid
30.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2679770  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-9 * page 4, lines 6-10; example 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0728473  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0790053  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 JPH09176097  [ ] (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD);
 [A]EP0647617  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1;
 [PX]WO9827958  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0875232  (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  - DATABASE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, STN, XP002123891 [X] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, STN, XP002123892 [A] 1 * abstract *
    [] - K. SAKURAI ET AL., "Development and application of an optically active ceramide", FRAGRANCE JOURNAL, Japan, (1997), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 92 - 98,