Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0918390

EP0918390 - Office workstation services [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2001
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.08.2001 [2001/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ackermann Limited
Michigan Drive, Tongwell Milton Keynes
Buckinghamshire MK15 8HQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]For all designated states
Ackermann Limited
Michigan Drive, Tongwell
Milton Keynes, Buckinghamshire MK15 8HQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Harrison, David Charles Peter
Church Farm House, 7 mile Street, Bozeat
Nothamptonshire, NN29 7 NB / GB
[1999/21]
Representative(s)Nash, Keith Wilfrid , et al
Nash Matthews
90-92 Regent Street
Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]Nash, Keith Wilfrid , et al
KEITH W. NASH & Co. Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street
Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB
Application number, filing date98309437.618.11.1998
[1999/21]
Priority number, dateGB1997002442319.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9724423
[1999/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0918390
Date:26.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0918390
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02J5/00
[1999/21]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/48]
Former [1999/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Büroarbeitsplatzdienste[1999/21]
English:Office workstation services[1999/21]
French:Services pour station de travail de bureau[1999/21]
Examination procedure23.09.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/33]
13.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/33]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.10.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0814557  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [PX] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 2,5 *;
 [A]FR2732169  (PEUGEOT [FR]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *