Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0919486

EP0919486 - Method and apparatus for applying a printed label to a metal container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Great Pacific Enterprises Inc.
1036 Aberdeen Street Hawkesbury
Ontario K6A 1K5 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]For all designated states
Great Pacific Enterprises Inc.
1036 Aberdeen Street
Hawkesbury, Ontario K6A 1K5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Pilon, Betty Jean
102 Fournier Street
Vankleek Hill, Ontario K0B 1RO / CA
02 / Fournier, Gilles
4691 Carillon Park Road
St. Eugene, Ontario K0B 1PO / CA
03 / Doherty, Terrence
298 Marple Street
Brownsburg, Quebec J0V 1AO / CA
[1999/22]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98309639.725.11.1998
[1999/22]
Priority number, dateCA1997222307101.12.1997         Original published format: CA 2223071
[1999/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0919486
Date:02.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0919486
Date:09.06.1999
[1999/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0919486
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65D25/20
[1999/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anbringung eines bedruckten Etiketts auf einem Blechbehälter[1999/22]
English:Method and apparatus for applying a printed label to a metal container[1999/22]
French:Procédé et appareil d'attachage d'une étiquette imprimée sur un récipient en tôle[1999/22]
Examination procedure21.10.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
14.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
01.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2002Fee for grant paid
24.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
LU25.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
DK04.12.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
MC01.06.2003
[2007/17]
Former [2006/44]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
LU25.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
MC01.06.2003
Former [2005/21]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
LU25.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/39]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
LU25.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/10]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
CY30.11.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/48]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
DE05.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/46]AT04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
DE05.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/22]GR04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE04.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US5366251  (BRANDT THOMAS L [US], et al) [A] 1,8,15,26 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 58; figures 1,2 *;
 [AP]WO9800294  (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [AP] 1,8,15,26 * page 6, line 6 - line 31; figure 1; claims 1,20 *;
 [A]GB793016  (UNIVERSAL METAL PRODUCTS LTD, et al) [A] 1,8,15,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2825159  (MILTON SCHOR) [A] 1,8,15,26 * column 1, line 15 - column 4, line 9; figure -; claims 1,5 *;
 [A]GB1566057  (MORGAN FAIREST LTD) [A] 15,26;
 [A]US4027426  (WALLDING WAYNE A, et al) [A] 15,26
by applicantCA1259183
 US3340121
 US3553044