Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0926177

EP0926177 - Interfacial method for preparing copolyestercarbonates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Davis, Gary Charles
5 Felicia Court
Albany, New York 12205 / US
[1999/26]
Representative(s)Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr. , et al
London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date98310039.708.12.1998
[1999/26]
Priority number, dateUS1997099689723.12.1997         Original published format: US 996897
[1999/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0926177
Date:30.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0926177
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08G63/64, C08G63/79
[1999/26]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/22]
Former [1999/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Grenzflächenverfahren zur Darstellung von Copolyestercarbonaten[1999/26]
English:Interfacial method for preparing copolyestercarbonates[1999/26]
French:Procédé interfacial pour la préparation de copolyestercarbonates[1999/26]
Examination procedure13.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
18.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/32]
05.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5274068  (BODEN EUGENE P [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6,7,9,10,12 * example 1; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0682056  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-4,6,7,10,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 22 *;
 [D]US5510449  (FLOWERS LARRY I [US], et al);
 [A]WO9109896  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-4,8-10,12 * abstract * * page 7, line 6 - line 16 * * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 5 * * page 23, line 25 - page 24, line 13 *;
 [A]FR2158390  (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1,2,4 * claim 1 * * page 5, line 33 - page 8, line 37 *