Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0922945

EP0922945 - Pressure sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nagano Keiki Co., Ltd.
30-4, Higashimagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Nagano Keiki Co., Ltd.
30-4, Higashimagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
Nagano Keiki Co., Ltd.
30-4, Higashimagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokio / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamagishi, Kouzou, c/o Nagano Keiki Co., Ltd.
30-4, Higashimagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Okumura, Toshiaki, c/o Nagano Keiki Co., Ltd.
30-4, Higashimagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Yamaura, Kunihiro, c/o Nagano Keiki Co., Ltd.
30-4, Higashimagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Yokoyama, Takayuki, c/o Nagano Keiki Co., Ltd.
30-4, Higashimagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Kobayashi, Kenji, c/o Nagano Keiki Co., Ltd.
30-4, Higashimagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1999/24]
Representative(s)Rackham, Stephen Neil
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1999/24]Jackson, Peter Arthur
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98310145.210.12.1998
[1999/24]
Priority number, dateJP1997034122711.12.1997         Original published format: JP 34122797
[1999/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0922945
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0922945
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0922945
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01L19/00, G01L9/04, G01L9/00
[2000/08]
Former International [1999/24]G01L19/00, G01L9/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/44]
Former [1999/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Druckwandler[1999/24]
English:Pressure sensor[1999/24]
French:Capteur de pression[1999/24]
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
30.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2002Fee for grant paid
19.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5255427  (HAFNER HANS W [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 22 - line 64 *;
 [A]US5509312  (DONZIER ERIC P [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *