blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0923020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH11242557Global Dossier 07.09.1999A
Priority number Date
US98965797 12.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0923020Global Dossier 19.04.2000A3
EP0923020 16.06.1999A2
Priority number Date
US98965797 12.12.1997