Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0923020

Designated contracting states
Examination procedure07.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/28]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.06.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:16.06.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7G 06F 3/02 A, 7G 06K 11/18 B
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:27.12.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
 
Event date:11.07.2001 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20001020