Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0923020

EP0923020 - Ergonomic computer control device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2001
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.07.2001 [2001/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ergonomic Technologies Corporation
185 South Street Oyster Bay
New York 11771 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
Ergonomic Technologies Corporation
185 South Street
Oyster Bay, New York 11771 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mitchell, Dennis
185 South Street
Oyster Bay, New York 11771 / US
[1999/24]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date98310184.111.12.1998
[1999/24]
Priority number, dateUS1997098965712.12.1997         Original published format: US 989657
[1999/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0923020
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0923020
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/02, G06K11/18
[2000/14]
Former International [1999/24]G06F3/02
Designated contracting states[2000/52]
Former [1999/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ergonomische Rechnersteuerungsvorrichtung[1999/24]
English:Ergonomic computer control device[1999/24]
French:Dispositif ergonomique de commande d' ordinateur[1999/24]
Examination procedure20.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/28]
07.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/28]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US5626427  (HATHAWAY STEVEN W ET AL) [X] 1,2,6-9,14-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 52 - column 9, line 23 * * figures 4-7 * [A] 11-13 [Y] 3-5,10;
 [XA]US5231380  (LOGAN JAMES D) [X] 1,2,7,14,16 * column 3, line 8 - column 5, line 12 * * figures 1A,1B-3 * [A] 6,13;
 [XAY]US5343219  (DUBOSQUE JR CLAYTON) [X] 16 * column 3, line 8 - column 5, line 36 * * figures 1-7 * [A] 1,8,9,13 [Y] 3-5;
 [XA]FR2703165  (MANZO BODRONE MARC) [X] 16 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 4 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1,3-5,8,9,13;
 [YA]EP0654727  (MICROSOFT CORP) [Y] 10 * column 6, line 47 - column 15, line 22 * * figures 1-14 * [A] 1,11,16